Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruggero Augusto Catizone

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1840Born
28 Feb 186323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Catanzaro, Italy
28 Sep 189555.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy
28 Sep 189555.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
Oct 1895²55.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
Jan 1908³67.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ruggero Augusto Catizone
Bishop Ruggero Augusto Catizone (born , died Jan 1908) Auxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTre Taverne, Diocese of Catanzaro
Ordained BishopCatanzaro, Diocese of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 132
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 47
  • ab: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1907, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jun 2017