Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Consalvo Caputo

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1598³BornNapoli
18 Feb 163031.9AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
24 Feb 163031.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
8 Aug 163335.4AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
19 Nov 164547.6DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Consalvo Caputo
Bishop Consalvo Caputo (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231, and Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 32
  • ob/c2: AT, 11 Jul 2016
  • c34: AT, 10 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016