Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gori

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1645³BornSienne
7 Jul 168742.2AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
13 Jul 168742.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
4 Oct 170661.4AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
1708²62.6DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gori:
Bishop Francesco Gori (born , died 1708) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149, and Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015