Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo de Paola

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jul 1523AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
17 Jan 1524Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
9 May 1530AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
1532¹DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo de Paola
Bishop Girolamo de Paola (died 1532) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacristy, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158, and Page 256
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,462

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast