Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Cesarini (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Administrator of Cuenca


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1517Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 1517InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Sergio e Bacco
6 Jun 1519AppointedAdministrator of Gerace, Italy
15 Jun 1519ResignedAdministrator of Gerace, Italy
27 Dec 1520AppointedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
14 Dec 1523AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
9 Apr 1526AppointedAdministrator of Otranto, Italy
20 Jul 1526AppointedAdministrator of Alessano, Italy
15 Nov 1531ResignedAdministrator of Alessano, Italy
21 Aug 1534AppointedAdministrator of Gerace, Italy
22 Mar 1536ResignedAdministrator of Otranto, Italy
15 May 1536AppointedAdministrator of Catanzaro, Italy
18 Aug 1536ResignedAdministrator of Catanzaro, Italy
2 Sep 1536AppointedAdministrator of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
20 Feb 1538ResignedAdministrator of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
20 Feb 1538ResignedAdministrator of Gerace, Italy
24 May 1538AppointedAdministrator of Cuenca, Spain
5 Jun 1538ResignedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
31 May 1540AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Nov 1541AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
13 Feb 1542DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Cesarini (Sr.):
Cardinal Alessandro Cesarini (Sr.) (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 24.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 103, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 262, and Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013