Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Spinelli d’Acquaro, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1663³Born
1685¹21.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Sep 171451.6AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
23 Sep 171451.6Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
12 Sep 172764.6DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Spinelli d’Acquaro
Bishop Emanuele Spinelli d’Acquaro C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAquara

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 150
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast