Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de la Cruz Calienes Olazabal, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1799BornArequipa
24 Apr 181717.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1823²23.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
1823²23.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jan 186565.1SelectedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
27 Mar 186565.3ConfirmedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
24 Aug 186565.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
15 Feb 186666.2InstalledBishop of Arequipa, Peru
26 Jun 186767.6DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Cruz Calienes Olazabal:
Bishop Juan de la Cruz Calienes Olazabal O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 119
  • od/op/c01: LB, 30 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013