Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Chávez Ponce

Deceased

Bishop of Puno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1802BornArequipa
18 Dec 182422.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arequipa, Peru
23 Sep 182624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
23 Apr 187573.3SelectedBishop of Puno, Peru
5 Jul 187573.5ConfirmedBishop of Puno, Peru
25 Feb 187674.1Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru
4 Mar 187674.1InstalledBishop of Puno, Peru
11 Mar 187977.2DiedBishop of Puno, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Chávez Ponce:
Bishop Pedro José Chávez Ponce (born , died ) Bishop of Puno

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 472
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013