Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Zaplana Bellizza

Deceased

Bishop of Tacna, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1912Born
12 Mar 193826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tacna, Peru
14 Jul 195240.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
14 Jul 195240.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
14 Sep 195240.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agbia
17 Dec 195745.9AppointedBishop of Tacna, Peru
28 Apr 197361.2DiedBishop of Tacna, Peru

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Zaplana Bellizza
Bishop Alfonso Zaplana Bellizza (born , died ) Bishop of Tacna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoquegua

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast