Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo José Rodriguez Ballón, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1909Born
21 Apr 193526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Dec 194334.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
30 Dec 194334.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Isinda
6 Feb 194434.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isinda
6 Jul 194536.3AppointedBishop of Huancayo, Peru
13 Jun 194637.2AppointedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
26 Sep 198071.5ResignedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
6 Oct 199283.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Leonardo José Rodriguez Ballón
Archbishop Leonardo José Rodriguez Ballón O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast