Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Noriega Arce, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Mutia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1922Born
6 Oct 195230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Apr 198057.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
26 Apr 198057.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutia
1 Jun 198057.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutia
26 Jun 199370.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Noriega Arce
Bishop Alfredo Noriega Arce S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast