Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Chávez de la Rosa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1740Born
18 Dec 178646.4AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
23 Jan 178847.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
6 Sep 178848.2InstalledBishop of Arequipa, Peru
9 May 180564.8ResignedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
26 Oct 181979.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Chávez de la Rosa
Bishop Pedro José Chávez de la Rosa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCádiz, Spain
Ordained BishopSts Peter and Paul, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 98
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,700, Page 105, Number 546
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast