Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Segundo Ballón Manrique

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arequipa

Titular Bishop of Arabissus

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1854BornTiabaya
20 Jul 187925.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 189642.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
3 Dec 189642.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
21 Mar 189742.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
24 Aug 189844.2AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
1906²51.6ResignedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
11 Aug 190955.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arabissus
11 Aug 190955.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
21 Aug 192369.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Segundo Ballón Manrique:
Bishop Manuel Segundo Ballón Manrique (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arequipa

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 119, and Page 285
  • b: LB, 8 Feb 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013