Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Villagómez Vivanco

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1589BornCastroverde del Campo, Spain
6 Jan 163242.2SelectedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
2 Aug 163242.8ConfirmedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
25 Sep 163343.9Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
16 Jul 164050.7AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
22 May 164151.6InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
12 May 167181.5DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Villagómez Vivanco:
Archbishop Pedro de Villagómez Vivanco (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 93, and Page 221
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 158, Number 998
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015