Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Pamplona González Bassecourt, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1719³BornPamplona, Spain
10 Dec 178162.6AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
30 Jun 178263.2Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
10 Dec 178465.6ResignedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
11 Mar 179272.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Pamplona González Bassecourt:
Bishop Miguel de Pamplona González Bassecourt O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arequipa

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,904
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 98
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 509

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013