Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Alberto Bustamante López

Bishop of Sicuani, Peru

Apostolic Administrator of Ayaviri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1965 Born
7 Dec 199227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
10 Jul 201348.5AppointedPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
15 Aug 201348.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
17 Aug 201348.6InstalledPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
29 Sep 202055.7AppointedBishop of Sicuani, Peru
7 Apr 202156.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ayaviri, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Alberto Bustamante López
Bishop Pedro Alberto Bustamante López (born ) Bishop of Sicuani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotaparaco, Recuay, Diocese of Huaraz
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Arequipa, Archdiocese of Arequipa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sicuani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2013
  • ob/c23: CB, 10 Aug 2013
  • i: CB, 11 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,849
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2020
  • aadm: CB, 7 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast