Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Vargas Ruiz de Somocurcio, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1918Born
17 Dec 194931.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Sep 197153.5AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
13 Nov 197153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
18 Jan 197859.8AppointedArchbishop of Piura, Peru
26 Sep 198062.5AppointedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
2 Mar 199677.9RetiredArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
8 Dec 200385.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Fernando Vargas Ruiz de Somocurcio
Archbishop Fernando Vargas Ruiz de Somocurcio S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast