Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Argüelles, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659²BornLima, Peru
18 May 169940.4AppointedBishop of Panamá
1701²42.0Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
21 Mar 171152.2AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
23 Jan 171253.1DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Argüelles:
Bishop Juan de Argüelles O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 97, and Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014