Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe María Zalba Elizalde, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Chuquibamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1927BornSantoña, Spain
13 Jul 195831.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Dec 198053.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
18 Dec 198053.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
1 Mar 198153.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
29 Feb 198456.8AppointedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
19 Oct 199972.4DiedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Felipe María Zalba Elizalde:
Bishop Felipe María Zalba Elizalde O.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Chuquibamba

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013