Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago José O’ Phelan Recabarren

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1774³Born
18 Feb 180025.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arequipa, Peru
21 Feb 180025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
23 Dec 184066.3SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
12 Jul 184166.9ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
13 Mar 184267.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
9 Jul 184570.8InstalledBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
22 Sep 185783.0DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santiago José O’ Phelan Recabarren
Bishop Santiago José O’ Phelan Recabarren (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 208
  • odd/opd/c01: LB, 26 Jan 2013
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast