Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Carpenter Aponte

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Lorea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1830Born
4 Jul 186939.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jul 186939.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 189161.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
4 Jun 189161.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorea
6 Sep 189161.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lorea
3 Jun 190575.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for José María Carpenter Aponte (VIAF: 221175432)
Bishop José María Carpenter Aponte (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa, Diocese of Arequipa
Ordained BishopSan Pedro, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017