Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Cichy

Bishop Emeritus of Legnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1939 BornPrzyszowice
23 Jun 196324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
26 Aug 199859.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
26 Aug 199859.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonusta
12 Sep 199859.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonusta
19 Mar 200566.0AppointedBishop of Legnica, Poland
30 Apr 200566.1InstalledBishop of Legnica, Poland
16 Apr 201475.0RetiredBishop of Legnica, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Cichy:
Bishop Stefan Cichy (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Legnica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Legnica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,381
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014