Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Roszynski, S.V.D.

Bishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1962 Born
30 Apr 198926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
6 Feb 201552.4AppointedBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
25 Apr 201552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Wewak, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Józef Roszynski
Bishop Józef Roszynski S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Wewak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNidzica, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wewak.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 18 Feb 2015
  • c2: CB, 17 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 25 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 May 2017