Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Greger

Auxiliary Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec

Titular Bishop of Assava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1964 BornTychy
2 Oct 198824.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Katowice, Poland
13 May 198925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
25 Mar 199228.0IncardinatedPriest of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland
22 Oct 201147.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland
22 Oct 201147.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Assava
27 Nov 201147.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assava

MicroData Summary for Piotr Greger:
Bishop Piotr Greger (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bielsko-Żywiec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2011
  • c1: CB, 22 Oct 2011
  • ob: CB, 26 Oct 2011
  • c2+: CB, 7 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013