Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Turner

Deceased

Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1799Born
18 Dec 182425.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
17 Dec 182526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185151.7AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 185151.8Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 187272.8DiedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Turner
Bishop William Turner (born , died ) Bishop of Salford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhittingham Hall, near Preston, Lancashire
Ordained BishopSaint John Cathedral, Salford, Diocese of Salford, England

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c34: CB, 10 Nov 2014
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 196
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,294
  • od/op: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017