Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Laird Patterson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1822Born
1850¹27.1Converted
1855²32.1Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
30 Apr 188057.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
30 Apr 188057.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
9 May 188057.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
2 Dec 190280.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Laird Patterson (VIAF: 29187978)
Bishop James Laird Patterson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWigmore Street, Marylebone, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary Moorfields, Pro-Cathedral, City of London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSt. Mary, Church, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 259
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 28
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast