Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kyle

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Germanicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1788BornEdinburgh
21 Mar 181223.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 182738.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Feb 182738.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
28 Sep 182840.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
23 Feb 186980.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Kyle:
Bishop James Kyle (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013