Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Scandella

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

Titular Bishop of Antinoë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1821Born
25 Mar 184523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gibraltar
28 Apr 185735.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
28 Apr 185735.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antinoë
30 Nov 185736.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antinoë
27 Aug 188058.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Scandella (VIAF: 316390759)
Bishop John Baptist Scandella (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Anges-Bayswater, London

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017