Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Etheridge, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Torone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1808Born
2 Jul 185849.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
6 Jul 185849.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Torone
17 Oct 185849.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Torone
31 Dec 187769.1DiedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for James Etheridge
Bishop James Etheridge S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of British Guiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWorcester, Great Britain
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 559
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,344
  • ob: CB, 31 May 2015
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,858, Number 49
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast