Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Vaughan

Deceased

Bishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1814Born
1837²22.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Western District, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 183824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, England, Great Britain
10 Jul 185541.4AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
16 Sep 185541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
25 Oct 190288.6DiedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Vaughan (VIAF: 65983569)
Bishop William Vaughan (born , died ) Bishop of Plymouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon
Ordained BishopHoly Apostles Cathedral, Clifton, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 460
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 203
  • od/c0: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017