Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Errington

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1804Born
23 Dec 182622.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 182723.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 185146.7AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 185146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
7 Aug 185146.8InstalledBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
30 Mar 185550.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
30 Mar 185550.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
16 Sep 185551.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Clifton, England, Great Britain
6 Feb 185752.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Clifton, England, Great Britain
22 Jul 186055.8ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
19 Jan 188681.3DiedCoadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Errington (VIAF: 63532805)
Archbishop George Errington (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClintz, Yorkshire
Ordained BishopSaint John Cathedral, Salford, Diocese of Salford, England

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 460, and Page 562
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 597
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 89
  • c4: CB, 10 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,293
  • od/aadm: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017