Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Julien Weber, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1888BornLutterbach
29 Jun 191224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
19 May 194557.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
1 Jun 194557.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
1 Jun 194557.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
29 Jun 194557.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
29 Aug 194557.5SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
25 Mar 196274.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Strasbourg, France
30 Dec 196678.9RetiredBishop of Strasbourg, France
13 Feb 198193.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Julien Weber:
Archbishop Jean-Julien Weber P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013