Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Alfred Bernardin Hoffmann, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Djibouti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1909BornSiewiller, France
20 Apr 193525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Sep 194536.0AppointedPrefect of Djibouti
12 Apr 195747.6AppointedBishop of Djibouti
4 Aug 195747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Djibouti
21 Mar 197969.5DiedBishop of Djibouti

MicroData Summary for Henri Alfred Bernardin Hoffmann:
Bishop Henri Alfred Bernardin Hoffmann O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Djibouti

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013