Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Adolphe Messmer, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ambanja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1900BornWingen, France
28 Mar 192524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Nov 193737.1AppointedPrefect of Isole di Mayotta, Nossi-Bé e Comore, Madagascar
14 Jun 193837.7AppointedPrefect of Ambanja, Madagascar
8 Mar 195150.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Coropissus
8 Mar 195150.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ambanja, Madagascar
29 Jun 195150.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coropissus
14 Sep 195554.9AppointedBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
5 Jun 197574.6RetiredBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
5 Jun 197574.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Comores
2 May 198079.6RetiredApostolic Administrator of Comores
10 Feb 198786.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ambanja, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Léon-Adolphe Messmer:
Bishop Léon-Adolphe Messmer O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ambanja

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015