Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène-Jacques Grellier

Deceased

Bishop of Laval, France

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1850Born
20 Dec 187323.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190656.1AppointedBishop of Laval, France
25 Feb 190656.1Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
15 Jun 193686.4RetiredBishop of Laval, France
15 Jun 193686.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
23 Feb 193989.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Jacques Grellier
Archbishop Eugène-Jacques Grellier (born , died ) Bishop of Laval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoué-Etiau
Ordained BishopS. Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,906, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 133
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 714, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 846, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,033, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast