Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme-Théodore Lingenheim, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sokodé, Togo

Titular Bishop of Thunudruma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1906Born
3 Jan 193225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
7 Jun 194639.5AppointedPrefect of Sokodé, Togo
4 Jul 195649.6AppointedBishop of Sokodé, Togo
28 Oct 195649.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sokodé, Togo
18 Nov 196458.0ResignedBishop of Sokodé, Togo
18 Nov 196458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunudruma
3 May 198578.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sokodé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Jérôme-Théodore Lingenheim
Bishop Jérôme-Théodore Lingenheim S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sokodé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHochstett, France

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast