Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Édouard-Lucien Rupp

Deceased

Permanent Observer Emeritus to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

Titular Archbishop of Dionysiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1905BornSt. Germain-en-Laye
31 Mar 193428.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 195449.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
28 Oct 195449.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
18 Jan 195549.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
9 Jun 196256.6AppointedBishop of Monaco
8 May 197165.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dionysiopolis
8 May 197165.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iraq
4 Mar 197569.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kuwait
13 Jul 197872.7AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva
5 Jul 198074.7RetiredPermanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva
28 Jan 198377.2DiedPermanent Observer Emeritus to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

MicroData Summary for Jean-Édouard-Lucien Rupp
Archbishop Jean-Édouard-Lucien Rupp (born , died ) Permanent Observer Emeritus of United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ab/pnun/xxkw: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 67, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016