Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie Pierre François Auguste Gaschy, C.S.Sp.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

Titular Bishop of Usinaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1941 Born
14 Dec 196827.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Jul 196928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
19 Jun 200967.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
19 Jun 200967.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Usinaza
11 Oct 200968.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usinaza
1 Mar 201876.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

MicroData Summary for Marie Pierre François Auguste Gaschy
Bishop Marie Pierre François Auguste Gaschy C.S.Sp. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColmar, France
Ordained PriestEguisheim
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Saint-Pierre, Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,313
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast