Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hascher, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Juruá, Acre

Titular Bishop of Aeliae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1890BornMichelbach-le Haut, France
28 Oct 192029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Mar 194756.3AppointedPrelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
22 Mar 194756.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeliae
5 Jun 194756.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aeliae
25 Feb 196776.2RetiredPrelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
8 May 197382.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of Juruá, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Hascher:
Bishop José Hascher C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Juruá

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013