Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Jerôme Adam, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Libreville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1904BornWittenheim, France
28 Oct 192824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Jul 194743.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Libreville, Gabon
10 Jul 194743.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhinocorura
9 Dec 194743.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhinocorura
14 Sep 195551.3AppointedBishop of Libreville, Gabon
11 Dec 195854.5AppointedArchbishop of Libreville, Gabon
29 May 196965.0ResignedArchbishop of Libreville, Gabon
29 May 196965.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Brixellum
27 Oct 197672.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Brixellum
11 Jul 198177.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Libreville, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jerôme Adam:
Archbishop Jean-Jerôme Adam C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Libreville

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013