Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Dib

Deceased

Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1881BornDlepta, Lebanon
16 Mar 190725.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 194664.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
5 Jul 194665.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
30 Jul 194665.1AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
4 Nov 196584.4DiedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Pietro Dib:
Bishop Pietro Dib (born , died ) Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo}

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013