Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Félix-Albert-Marie Vilnet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1922BornChaumont
22 Oct 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 196442.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
13 Dec 196442.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
13 Aug 198361.3AppointedBishop of Lille, France
2 Jul 199876.2RetiredBishop of Lille, France
23 Jan 201390.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Félix-Albert-Marie Vilnet:
Bishop Jean-Félix-Albert-Marie Vilnet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lille

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB, 23 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013