Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Jean Edmond Georges Gaillot

Titular Bishop of Parthenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1935 Born
18 Mar 196125.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 198246.6AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
20 Jun 198246.7Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
13 Jan 199559.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Parthenia

MicroData Summary for Jacques Jean Edmond Georges Gaillot
Bishop Jacques Jean Edmond Georges Gaillot (born ) Titular Bishop of Parthenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Dizier

Please contact the Bishop through the Titular See of Parthenia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast