Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Kuehn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1922Born
28 Jun 194725.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint-Dié, France
12 Jul 194725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Dié, France
13 May 197452.1AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
15 Jun 197452.2Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
27 Aug 198664.4ResignedBishop of Meaux, France
25 Jun 200886.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Kuehn (VIAF: 311209505)
Bishop Louis Kuehn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Dié, Diocese of Saint-Dié
Ordained DeaconSaint-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Meaux, Diocese of Meaux
Death PlaceLure, Archdiocese of Besançon
Buried Place (Original)Villersexel, Cemetery, Besançon, Archdiocese of Besançon

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast