Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Georges Deledicque

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

Titular Bishop of Hierpiniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1925Born
20 Dec 195227.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
19 Jun 198762.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
19 Jun 198762.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
20 Sep 198762.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
25 Aug 199772.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Georges Deledicque
Bishop Jean-Georges Deledicque (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilly-Montigny

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,159
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast