Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Joseph Piérard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Châlons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1899Born
23 Dec 192223.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Châlons, France
31 Mar 192324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Châlons, France
29 Dec 194546.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Châlons, France
29 Dec 194546.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
19 Mar 194647.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
9 Jan 194848.8SucceededBishop of Châlons, France
17 Sep 197374.5RetiredBishop of Châlons, France
18 Sep 199495.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for René-Joseph Piérard (VIAF: 9898462)
Bishop René-Joseph Piérard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Châlons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâlons-sur-Marne
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Châlons, Diocese of Châlons
Death PlaceChâlons, Diocese of Châlons

  • a priest for 71.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 18
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast