Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Michel Ghislain Delannoy

Bishop of Saint-Denis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1957 BornComines, Belgium
4 Jun 198932.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
30 Jun 200447.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
30 Jun 200447.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Usinaza
12 Sep 200447.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usinaza
10 Mar 200951.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Denis, France

MicroData Summary for Pascal Michel Ghislain Delannoy:
Bishop Pascal Michel Ghislain Delannoy (born ) Bishop of Saint-Denis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Denis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,682
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013