Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe Dufour

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1947 BornArmentières
9 Nov 197527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
24 Oct 200052.9AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
7 Jan 200153.1Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
20 May 200860.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Aix (-Arles), France
29 Mar 201062.3SucceededArchbishop of Aix (-Arles), France

MicroData Summary for Christophe Dufour:
Archbishop Christophe Dufour (born ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,878

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013