Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Joseph André Guillaume

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1929 Born
29 Jun 195424.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Amiens, France
9 Apr 195525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Amiens, France
29 Oct 198454.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
9 Dec 198455.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
14 Dec 200576.1RetiredBishop of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Joseph André Guillaume (VIAF: 89658959)
Bishop Paul-Marie Joseph André Guillaume (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunkerque, Diocese of Lille
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Dié, Cathedral, Saint-Dié, Diocese of Saint-Dié

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Dié.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2005
  • c1: CB
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast