Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Paul Herriot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1934Born
18 Apr 196025.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 198753.0AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
28 Jun 198753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
29 Apr 199964.9AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
22 Feb 200873.7ResignedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
14 Sep 201783.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

MicroData Summary for Marcel Paul Herriot
Bishop Marcel Paul Herriot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoussey
Death PlaceSaint-Dié, Diocese of Saint-Dié

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2008
  • d: CB, 15 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 15 Sep 2017